EP0960721 - Sheet of thermoplastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hostaglas Ltd. 7, Westgate Business Park, Ballymount Dublin 24 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Hostaglas Ltd. 7, Westgate Business Park, Ballymount Dublin 24 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schorning, Martin 9 Belvidere Place Montclair NJ 07042 / US | 02 /
Gunyuzlu, Mark 5514 Piper Glen Drive Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | 03 /
Henrici, Rainer Bahnhofstrasse 110 61267 Neu-Anspach / DE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110303.7 | 27.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | DE1998123991 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823991 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960721 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0960721 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29D7/01, B29C43/22, C08J5/18, B29C47/88, // B29K67:00 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
B29C43/222 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | B29D7/01, B29C43/22, // B29K67:00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/46] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Platte aus einem Thermoplast | [1999/48] | English: | Sheet of thermoplastic material | [1999/48] | French: | Plaque en matériau thermoplastique | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5271985 (TSUNASHIMA KENJI ET AL) [X] 1-9,13,14 * column 2, line 26 - line 35 * * column 2, line 42 - line 44 * * column 2, line 54 - line 55 * * column 2, line 66 * * column 3, line 48 - line 49 * * column 4, line 21; examples 1,2 * [Y] 10-12; | [DY]WO9638282 (HOECHST AG ;MURSCHALL URSULA (DE); GAWRISCH WOLFGANG (DE); BRUNOW) [DY] 10-12 * claims 14,17,18 *; | [A]DE3708354 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 10 - line 25 *; | [A]US4745019 (POSEY ROBERT G ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 39 - line 53 * |