EP0962692 - Luminaire comprising a view protective element against insects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zehetgruber, Otto Heimstättenstrasse 6 1140 Wein / AT | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99110617.0 | 02.06.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | DE1998125062 | 04.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19825062 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962692 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962692 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962692 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21S13/02, F21V3/00 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
F21S8/04 (EP,US);
F21V1/14 (EP);
F21V11/14 (EP);
F21V15/01 (EP);
F21V3/00 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/49] | F21S3/02, F21V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB [2002/04] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leuchte mit Sichtschutz gegen Insekten | [1999/49] | English: | Luminaire comprising a view protective element against insects | [1999/49] | French: | Luminaire avec un élément de protection contre les insectes | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.08.2007 | [2008/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4833575 (HAMILTON JAMES L [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, lines 6-10 * * column 2, lines 26-33; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2215447 (DESIGNED ARCHITECTURAL LIGHTIN [GB]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9* page 3, lines 22-32; figure 1 *; | [X]DE9213886U (ACKMANN G.) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 4, lines 3-6 * * page 4, lines 16-28 * * page 5, lines 17-24; figures 1,3,4 * |