EP0965590 - Process for the preparation of formylimidazoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONZA A.G. Münchensteinerstrasse 38 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mettler, Hanspeter, Dr. Finkenweg 12 3930 Visp / CH | 02 /
Hanselmann, Paul, Dr. Holzachra 25 3902 Brig-Glis / CH | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Kindermann Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 99111671.6 | 16.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | EP19980111174 | 18.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98111174 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965590 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/64, C07D233/68 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formylimidazolen | [1999/51] | English: | Process for the preparation of formylimidazoles | [1999/51] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de formylimidazoles | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH685496 (NIPPON GOHSEI KAGAKU KOGYO K. K.) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9210189 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP.) [A] 1 * page 20, line 32 - page 21, line 27 *; | [AP]EP0916659 (LONZA A.G.) [AP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AP]EP0913394 (LONZA A.G.) [AP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9804531 (CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.) [X] 7 * examples A28,A29,A31,A32,A33,A35 *; | [X]US4189543 (G. A. DOORAKIAN ET AL.) [X] 7 * Tabelle II, Beispiele 1 bis 4, chemische Formeln *; | [AD]US2847417 (W. E. ERNER) | [A] - F. B. STOCKER ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (197004), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 883 - 7, XP002118266 [A] 7 * Seite 885, Verbindung I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00829a003 | [A] - B. TARNCHOMPOO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, no. 40, pages 5779 - 80, XP002118267 [A] 7 * Seite 5780, Verbindung 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)97957-7 |