EP0969501 - Method of making power semiconductor components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/34] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Semikron Elektronik GmbH Postfach 82 02 51 D-90253 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzer, Reinhard, Dr. habil. Gartenstrasse 4 98693 Ilmenau / DE | 02 /
Netzel, Mario, Dr. Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 29 0642 Branunsbedra / DE | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 99112146.8 | 24.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129614 | 02.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829614 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969501 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969501 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/331, H01L21/332, H01L21/329 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H01L29/66136 (EP);
H01L29/66333 (EP);
H01L29/66363 (EP);
H01L29/66378 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Leistungshalbleiterbauelementen | [2000/01] | English: | Method of making power semiconductor components | [2000/01] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de composants de puissance semi-conducteurs | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH021985 ; | [Y]EP0313000 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 25 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [DY]EP0330122 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 5* column 3, line 20 - line 32; figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900313), vol. 014, no. 133, Database accession no. (E - 0902), & JP02001985 A 19900108 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | Examination | JPS60145660 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851206), vol. 009, no. 310, Database accession no. (E - 364), & JP60145660 A 19850801 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) |