EP0974461 - Vibrator-type inking system for a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walther, Thomas Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 16 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
Franz, Karl-Heinz Auraweg 4 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
Ortner, Robert Siedlung am Stein 26 63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
Hummel, Peter Schlesierstrasse 13 63069 Offenbach / DE | 05 /
Jung, Ulrich, Dr. Frankfurter Strasse 65a 65551 Limburg / DE | 06 /
Parlak, Hasan Dernburgweg 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 07 /
Funke, Manfred, Dr. Schutzbaumstrasse 12 63073 Offanbach/Main / DE | [2000/04] | Application number, filing date | 99112330.8 | 26.06.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | DE1998132722 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832722 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974461 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974461 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974461 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/15, B41F31/14 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B41F31/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | B41F31/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/52] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Heberfarbwerk für eine Druckmaschine | [2000/04] | English: | Vibrator-type inking system for a printing machine | [2000/04] | French: | Système d'encrage à preneur pour une machine à imprimer | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR574658 (MARINONI MACHINES ET MATERIEL) [Y] 4-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3706602 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1* siehe Zusammenfassung;; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE3917074 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [Y] 3,6 * column 2, line 32 - line 68; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE4017307 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DE]) [Y] 7-10 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 3, line 27 - line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP0475120 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 9, line 14 - column 11, line 21; figures 1-8 * [Y] 3-10 |