EP0969156 - Insulation element from straw and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweitzer, Jacob Dorfstrasse 16 D-85591 Vaterstetten / DE | For all designated states Vodermair, Hermann Vaterstettener Strasse 15 D-85598 Baldham / DE | For all designated states Schimmer-Wottrich, Renate Heimstättenstrasse 13 D-80805 München / DE | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandauer, Edgar, Dr. Ing. habil. Ibsenweg 4 06126 Halle / DE | 02 /
Schweitzer, Jacob Dorfstrasse 13 85591 Vaterstetten / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Kraft, Werner Patentanwalt Neuer Weg 12 04600 Altenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Kraft, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Patentanwalt Neuer Weg 12 04600 Altenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112452.0 | 30.06.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129261 | 01.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829261 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0969156 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0969156 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76, E04B1/74 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
E04B1/74 (EP);
E04B2001/745 (EP);
Y02A30/00 (EP);
Y02A30/244 (EP);
Y02B30/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | E04B1/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | Dämmstoffkörper aus Stroh und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2000/01] | English: | Insulation element from straw and its manufacturing method | [2000/01] | French: | Elément d'isolation de paille et son procédé de fabrication | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3545001 (AVENIR WAERMEDAEMMPLATTEN DIPL [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [XA]EP0808953 (CASE COMPOUNDS B V [NL]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 40 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 27 * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9633306 (ECCO GLEITTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 1 - line 25 * [A] 2; | [A]DE19648855 (ALCHIMEA NATURWAREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 59 - line 66 * | by applicant | DE3233121 | DE4211888 |