EP0971573 - Cooling means temperature control for electrically driven vehicle inverter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | [2004/52] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Technology) GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilpert, Gerald Alemannenstrasse 3 78787 Lauchringen / DE | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Andreas, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Dusseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Thielmann, Andreas, et al Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Gmeiner, Christa, et al DaimlerChrysler AG, C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Gmeiner, Christa, c/o DaimlerChrysler AG, et al Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10/Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/02] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr., et al ABB Business Services Ltd., Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16 / Bldg 699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 99112478.5 | 01.07.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | DE1998130656 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19830656 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971573 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971573 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971573 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H02M7/00, G05D23/19 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B60L9/16 (EP,US);
B60L9/00 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | H05K7/20, H02M7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/26] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlmitteltemperaturregelung zur Regelung der Kühlmitteltemperatur eines Stromrichters eines elektrisch angetriebenen Fahrzeuges | [2000/02] | English: | Cooling means temperature control for electrically driven vehicle inverter | [2000/02] | French: | Régulation de la température du moyen de refroidissement pour onduleur de véhicule à traction électrique | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 30.08.2006 | |
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | IT | 30.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06164178 ; | [A]JPH0521975 ; | [A] - FUHRER W M ET AL, "WATER-COOLED HIGH POWER GTO CONVERTERS FOR ELECTRIC TRACTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS,GB,LONDON, IEE, (19930913), vol. CONF. 5, pages 294 - 298, XP000416909 [A] 1 * page 295 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940908), vol. 018, no. 480, Database accession no. (E - 1603), & JP06164178 A 19940610 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930607), vol. 017, no. 295, Database accession no. (E - 1377), & JP05021975 A 19930129 (KOUFU NIHON DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |