EP0968701 - Micro- and/or mesoporous zeolitic fillers for dental composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeguDent GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states DeguDent GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Degussa Dental GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Karin, Dr. 136 Arrowhead Dr. West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
Bein, Thomas, Prof.Dr. 136 Arrowhead Dr. West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 03 /
Fischer, Reinhard, Prof.Dr. Lange Streifen 23 28357 Bremen / DE | 04 /
Rentsch, Harald, Dr. Grünaustrasse 17 63457 Hanau / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112664.0 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129870 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829870 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968701 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0968701 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A61K6/869 (EP);
A61K6/887 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/15] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikro- und/oder mesoporöse zeolithische Materialien als Füllkomponenten in Dentalkompositen | [2000/01] | English: | Micro- and/or mesoporous zeolitic fillers for dental composites | [2000/01] | French: | Charges en matériaux micro- et/ou mésoporeux zéolitiques pour des composites dentaires | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3034374 (DMG DENTAL MATERIAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]GB2257433 (PATEL BIPIN CHANDRA MULJIBHAI [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 18 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]EP0223245 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13 * page 3, line 5 - line 37 * * example 4 * * page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 3 * * claim - *; | [X]DE3039664 (KULZER & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]JPH09323912 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09323912 A 19971216 (SHINAGAWA FUEL CO LTD;SHINANEN ZEOMITSUKU:KK) [X] 1-10,12,13 * abstract * |