EP0977381 - Optical data bus for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gräf, Michael Elsenheimer Strasse 32 80687 München / DE | [2000/05] | Application number, filing date | 99112682.2 | 02.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE19981983361 | 25.07.1998 Original published format: DE 1983361 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977381 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977381 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/152, H04L12/12, B60R16/02 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H04B10/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | H04B10/152 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/31] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optischer Datenbus für ein Fahrzeug | [2000/05] | English: | Optical data bus for vehicle | [2000/05] | French: | Bus de données optique pour véhicule | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.07.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0457964 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-4* column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE4102659 (LEONISCHE DRAHTWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 49; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP0863637 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [PX] 1-4 * column 4, line 1 - column 4, line 49; figures 1,3 * |