EP0970744 - Chemical generator with controlled mixing and concentration feedback and adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munroe, James Platt 402 West Main Street Crawsfordville, IN 47933 / US | 02 /
Samsal, Richard Linton 1852 W. Winchester Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | 03 /
Greenawald, Bruce Herman 4469 Buchman Drive Schnecksville, PA 18078 / US | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99112759.8 | 01.07.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | US19980111316 | 07.07.1998 Original published format: US 111316 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0970744 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0970744 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/04, G05D11/13, H01L21/306 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
B01F33/80 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (KR);
B01F35/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/82 (EP,US);
B01F35/83 (EP,US);
G05D11/13 (KR);
H01L21/306 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | B01F15/04, G05D11/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | Chemischer Generator mit geregelten Mischbedingungen und mit rückgekoppelter und einstellbarer Konzentration | [2000/02] | English: | Chemical generator with controlled mixing and concentration feedback and adjustment | [2000/02] | French: | Générateur chimique avec conditions de mélange controlées et avec régulation à réaction et ajustement de la concentration | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 30.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4483357 (RAO JAGDISH J [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9639651 (STARTEC VENTURES INC [US], et al); | [DA]US5522660 (O'DOUGHERTY KEVIN T [US], et al); | [DA]US5242468 (CLARK R SCOT [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9639651 | US5522660 | US5148945 | US5242468 | US5330072 | US5370269 | US5496778 | US5426944 | US5539998 | US5644921 | WO9639265 | WO9639237 | WO9639263 | WO9639264 | WO9639266 | WO9641687 | - PETERS LAURA, "Point of use generation: the ultimate solution for chemical purit", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (199401), page 62-66 | - PETERS LAURA, "Product in action, Gas-to-chemical generation system reduces proc", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (199406), page 79-80 |