EP1067079 - Reeling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Ph. Nederman & Co. Sydhamnsgatan 2 252 28 Helsingborg / SE | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hedlund, Per Niclas Norra Stenbocksgatan 77 25443 Helsingborg / SE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Giver, Sören Bo Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Wagner, Karl Heinz H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99113004.8 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067079 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067079 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/44 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B65H75/4442 (EP);
B65H75/4484 (EP);
B65H2403/61 (EP);
B65H2403/7254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Aufwickelvorrichtung | [2001/02] | English: | Reeling device | [2001/02] | French: | Dispositif d'enroulement | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | BE | 28.01.2004 | CH | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | ES | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | LI | 28.01.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | DE | 29.04.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | GB | 06.07.2004 | IE | 06.07.2004 | LU | 06.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
ES | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
GB | 06.07.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
GB | 06.07.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1383276 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]US4446884 (RADER JR HOMER J [US]); | [A]EP0295231 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |