EP0985844 - Electronically controlled disc brake ventilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuffner, Walter Heisenbergstrasse 3 80937 München / DE | 02 /
Schönherr, Armin Loisacher Str. 48 a 82496 Oberau / DE | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Wesel-Mair, Julia, et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Wesel-Mair, Julia (DE), et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113014.7 | 06.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998138116 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838116 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985844 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985844 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985844 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/847 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B60B7/0086 (EP,US);
B60B19/10 (EP,US);
F16D65/847 (EP,US);
B60B2900/513 (EP,US);
F16D2065/783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/21] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisch gesteuerte Belüftung für eine Scheibenbremse | [2000/11] | English: | Electronically controlled disc brake ventilation | [2000/11] | French: | Ventilation à commande électronique pour freins à disque | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 20.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2269144 (MCLAREN CARS NV [AN]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 20 *; | [XY]DE4138464 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - line 29 * [Y] 2; | [YA]DE4243988 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,5; | [A]DE3834119 (KIRSCHNER PETER [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 50 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4420068 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4229945 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 9; figure - * |