EP0982591 - Imprints formed using functionally complemetary monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOSBACH, Klaus Lackalänga 31, PL 5548 S-244 94 Furulund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states MOSBACH, Klaus Lackalänga 31, PL 5548 S-244 94 Furulund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Stenbäck, Maria Elisabeth, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Stenbäck, Maria Elisabeth, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Jörgensson, Leif Sixten, et al Awapatent AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Wiklund, Ingrid Helena, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99113261.4 | 10.02.1995 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | SE19940000450 | 10.02.1994 Original published format: SE 9400450 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982591 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982591 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12Q1/37, G01N33/74 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B01J20/268 (EP,SE,US);
C07K16/4208 (EP,SE,US);
G01N33/686 (EP,SE,US);
G01N2600/00 (EP,SE,US);
Y10S264/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Durch funktionell komplementäre Monomere hergestellte Abdrücke | [2000/09] | English: | Imprints formed using functionally complemetary monomers | [2000/09] | French: | Empreintes produites en utilisant des monomères fonctionellement complémentaires | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 28.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/41] | 31.05.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/41] | Appeal following examination | 26.07.2004 | Appeal received No. T1304/04 | 05.10.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.05.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 31.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95910042.1 / EP0743870 | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2004 | 28.02.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5110833 (MOSBACH KLAUS [SE]); | [X]WO9309075 (FISCHER LUTZ [DE], et al); | [PX]WO9426381 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); |