EP0999305 - Apparatus for treating a web material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siquet, Marcel Rue Théo Renville, 24 4050 Chaudfontaine / BE | [2000/19] | Application number, filing date | 99113290.3 | 09.07.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | DE1998150760 | 05.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19850760 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0999305 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0999305 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/04 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
D21F5/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, IT, SE [2004/45] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn | [2000/19] | English: | Apparatus for treating a web material | [2000/19] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement d' une bande de matériau | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4359828 (THOMAS KEITH V) [X] 1,3,5,9,10,17-19 * column 11, line 12 - column 12, line 15 ** column 13, line 61 - column 13, line 68; figures 3,5,8 *; | [X]DE4314475 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,17-19 * column 5, line 24 - column 5, line 61; figures 1,3 * |