EP0949553 - Gas pressure regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 8000 Maryland Avenue Clayton Missouri 63105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 8000 Maryland Avenue Clayton Missouri 63105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olds, Charles M. Route 2, Box 152A Anna, Texas 75409 / US | 02 /
Hostutler, John D. 100 FM 982 Princeton, Texas 75407 / US | 03 /
Hood, Mark E. C/O Marshall Gas Controls 1000, Civic Centre Drive San Marcos, TX 78666 / US | 04 /
Lambeth, David W. 3508 Almond Lane McKinney, Texas 75070-7636 / US | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/41] | 01 /
Olds, Charles M. Route 2, Box 152A Anna, Texas 75409 / US | ||
02 /
Hostutler, John D. 100 FM 982 Princeton, Texas 75407 / US | |||
03 /
Hood, Mark E. 2304 Rothland Plano, Texas 75023 / US | |||
04 /
Lambeth, David W. 109 Forest Lane McKinney, Texas 75069 / US | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113337.2 | 13.03.1996 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | US19950414524 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 414524 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949553 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949553 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/06, G05D16/20 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G05D16/0683 (EP,US);
G05D16/0402 (EP,US);
G05D16/0697 (EP);
Y10T137/7795 (EP,US);
Y10T137/783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT [1999/41] | Title | German: | Gas Druckregler | [1999/41] | English: | Gas pressure regulator | [1999/41] | French: | Régulateur de pression pour gaz | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96909678.3 / EP0817990 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0105959 (REITER HEINZ ALBERT) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 38 - column 10, line 62; figures 1-5; claims 1-13 *; | [A]DE3813962 (GOK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 18; figures 1-3; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP0499507 (US DIVERS CO INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 41 - column 11, line 18; figures 1-5 * |