EP0965336 - Microencapsulated DNA for gene therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Health Richmond House 79 Whitehall London SW1A 2NS / GB | [2013/26] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Health Protection Agency Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JG / GB | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Health Protection Agency Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0PG / GB | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states MICROBIOLOGICAL RESEARCH AUTHORITY Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research, Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farar, Graham Henry Parkwater, Whiteparish, Salisbury Wiltshire SP5 2QR / GB | 02 /
Jones, David Hugh, Microbiol.Research Authority Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research Porton Down, Salisbury, Wilts. SP4 0JG / GB | 03 /
Clegg, James Christopher Stephen, Microbiol.Res. Aut., Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research Porton Down, Salisbury, Wilts. SP4 0JG / GB | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/51] | 01 /
Farrar, Graham Henry, Microbiol.Research Authority Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research Porton Down, Salisbury, Wilts. SP4 0JG / GB | ||
02 /
Jones, David Hugh, Microbiol.Research Authority Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research Porton Down, Salisbury, Wilts. SP4 0JG / GB | |||
03 /
Clegg, James Christopher Stephen, Microbiol.Res. Aut., Centre for Applied Microbiology and Research Porton Down, Salisbury, Wilts. SP4 0JG / GB | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/51] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99113415.6 | 11.11.1996 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | GB19950023019 | 09.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9523019 | GB19960001929 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601929 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965336 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/00, A61K39/15, A61K39/165, A61K48/00 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/15 (EP,US);
A61K39/165 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/542 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
C12N2720/12334 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18434 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/36] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikroverkapselte DNA zur Gentherapie | [1999/51] | English: | Microencapsulated DNA for gene therapy | [1999/51] | French: | ADN microencapsulé s'appliquant dans des procédés de thérapie génique | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96938326.4 / EP0862419 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960938326) is 16.08.1999 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9423738 (MEDISORB TECHNOLOGIES INTERNAT [US]) [DX] 1-21 * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 31 - page 30, line 10 *; | [A]WO9520660 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL [US], et al) [A] * page 1, line 27 - page 3, line 13 * * page 6, line 16 - page 13, line 33 * * page 40 - page 42; example 9 *; | [X]WO9524929 (UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 5, line 15 - page 19, line 29 *; | [A] - RAJASUBRAMANIAN G ET AL, "FABRICATION OF RESORBABLE MICROPOROUS INTRAVASCULAR STENTS FOR GENE THERAPY APPLICATIONS", ASAIO JOURNAL, (19940701), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 584 - 589, XP000498246 [A] * see page M584, abstract * | [DA] - MORRIS W ET AL, "POTENTIAL OF POLYMER MICROENCAPSULATION TECHNOLOGY FOR VACCINE INNOVATION", VACCINE, (19940101), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 5 - 11, XP000578212 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90003-5 | [A] - SAH H K ET AL, "BIODEGRADABLE MICROCAPSULES PREPARED BY A W/O/W TECHNIQUE: EFFECTS OF SHEAR FORCE TO MAKE A PRIMARY W/O EMULSION ON THEIR MORPHOLOGY AND PROTEIN RELEASE", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, (19950101), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 59 - 69, XP000486815 [A] * see page 59, abstract * | [A] - NELLORE ET AL, "APPLICATION OF BIODEGRADABLE MICROSPHERES TO HEPATITIS B SURFACE ANTIGEN VACCINATION SYSTEM", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 8, page S151, XP002026578 [A] * see abstract PDD7098 * |