EP0982265 - Method and device for degassing a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwarte Logistic GmbH Kruppstrasse 2a 59227 Ahlen / DE | [2004/19] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states BARTEC Logistic Management GmbH Kruppstrasse 2/a 59227 Ahlen / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states BARTEC Componenten und Systeme GmbH Max-Eyth-Str. 16 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113724.1 | 13.07.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998139111 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19839111 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982265 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982265 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982265 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/58 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A01J11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [2000/47] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entgasen einer Flüssigkeit | [2000/09] | English: | Method and device for degassing a liquid | [2000/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le transvasement de liquide | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 12.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.10.2004 | [2008/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1460636 (SCHWARTE GMBH ALFONS); | [DY]DE3440310 (TUCHENHAGEN GMBH [DE]) [DY] 12,13 * page 7, line 23 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0226432 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) [Y] 11-13 * column 3, line 26 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [DYA]DE3909578 (SCHWARTE WERK GMBH [DE]) [DY] 11-13 * column 5, line 3 - line 37; figures 1,1A * [A] 1 | Examination | - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1984), vol. 24 | by applicant | DE3440310 | DE3909578 | DE3837765 |