EP0977291 - Positive electrode of a lithium ion cell for use at high load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Automotive Systems GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | [2004/02] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states NBT GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states VARTA Aktiengesllschaft Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäuerlein, Peter, Dr. Röntgenstrasse 12 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Sabine Sigmund Freud Strasse 103 60435 Frankfurt / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Gundelhardtstrasse 72 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113744.9 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE1998134091 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834091 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977291 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977291 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, H01M4/62, H01M4/04 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/623 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/04 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Positivelektrode von Lithium-Ionen-Zellen für Hochlastanwendungen | [2000/05] | English: | Positive electrode of a lithium ion cell for use at high load | [2000/05] | French: | Electrode positive d'une pile au lithium pour une utilisation à forte charge | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.01.2003 | GR | 29.01.2003 | IE | 29.01.2003 | IT | 29.01.2003 | NL | 29.01.2003 | DK | 29.04.2003 | PT | 29.04.2003 | SE | 29.04.2003 | AT | 14.07.2003 | CY | 14.07.2003 | LU | 14.07.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | BE | 31.07.2003 | CH | 31.07.2003 | LI | 31.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
AT | 14.07.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.07.2003 | ||
LI | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
IE | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 29.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10188993 ; | [A]EP0601754 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 2, line 45 - line 47 * * page 3, line 42 - line 50 * * page 5, line 8 - line 28 * * page 5, line 35 - line 37 * * page 5, line 50 - line 56 *; | [A]WO9719477 (VALENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 14, line 10 - line 19 * * page 15, line 9 - line 14 * * example 2 *; | [A]WO9805083 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,3; | [PA]EP0858117 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1,3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 24 - line 32 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 3 ** example 1 *; | [PA]EP0871233 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PA] * page 3, line 31 - line 38 * * page 4, line 34 - line 37 * * page 7, line 51 - line 54 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10188993 A 19980721 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - INOUE, TOMOHIRO ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous electrolyte batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980831), vol. 129, no. 9, Database accession no. 111378, XP002122842 [ ] * abstract * |