EP0985601 - Wing unit for manned and unmanned flying devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalkbrenner, Wolfgang Aufkirch Haus 39 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalkbrenner, Wolfgang Aufkirch Haus 39 88662 Überlingen / DE | 02 /
Kalkbrenner, Andreas Aufkirch Haus 39 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99113791.0 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998132008 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832008 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985601 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985601 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B64D17/02, B64C3/48, B64D25/08 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B64D17/025 (EP);
B64C3/28 (EP);
B64C3/30 (EP);
B64C31/036 (EP);
B64D25/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/17] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tragwerk für bemannte und unbemannte Fluggeräte | [2000/11] | English: | Wing unit for manned and unmanned flying devices | [2000/11] | French: | Aile pour des appareils à vol équipé et non équipé | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/35] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2002 | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3903779 (KAECK ALEXANDER) [XD] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE4032481 (REICH STEFAN) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 23-27 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0129026 (DORNIER GMBH) [X] 1 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 2 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US4708078 (LEGAIGNOUX DOMINIQUE M ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 15-21 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 17 * * figures 1-3 * |