EP0974622 - Mixture of water soluble reactive azo dyes, process to manufacture it and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2002/40] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Eschenheimer Tor 2 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russ, Werner, Dr. Bad Weilbachstrasse 9 65439 Flörsheim-Wicker / DE | 02 /
Gröbel, Bengt-Thomas, Dr. Am Weihersberg 8 65529 Niederems / DE | 03 /
Schumacher, Christian, Dr. Hornauerstrasse 41 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2000/04] | Application number, filing date | 99113892.6 | 16.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | DE1998132604 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832604 | DE1998142580 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19842580 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974622 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974622 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B62/006, D06P1/38 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C09B67/0052 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
D06P1/38 (EP,US);
D06P1/382 (KR);
D06P3/10 (KR);
Y10S8/918 (US);
Y10S8/924 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | Farbstoffmischung von wasserlöslichen faserreaktiven Azofarbstoffen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [2000/04] | English: | Mixture of water soluble reactive azo dyes, process to manufacture it and its use | [2000/04] | French: | Mélange de colorants azoiques réactifs aquasolubles, son procédé de fabrication et son utilisation | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.11.2002 | GR | 20.11.2002 | DK | 20.02.2003 | SE | 20.02.2003 | AT | 16.07.2003 | CY | 16.07.2003 | IE | 16.07.2003 | LU | 16.07.2003 | BE | 31.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
AT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
IE | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
IE | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
IE | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
IE | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 20.11.2002 | |
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 20.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0299315 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0308787 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [D]US4988803 (STOEHR FRANK M [DE], et al); | [D]US5097021 (STOEHR FRANK-MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]EP0525572 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YX]EP0546372 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 4, line 45 * [X] 1-4,8,10,11; | [D]US5342927 (REDDIG WOLFRAM [DE], et al); | [A]EP0627471 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0719841 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [D]US5541300 (BOOTZ KONRAD [DE], et al); | [Y]DE19519620 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * |