EP1070741 - Coprocessed polysaccharide product with crosslinked polyvinylpyrrolidone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fit GmbH Am Werk 9 02788 Hirschfelde / DE | [2003/01] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Emess AG Gewerbestrasse 14 4123 Allschwil 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Kurt H., Prof. Dr. Im Finkeler 4 79112 Freiburg / DE | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Peter, et al PRIO Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Sommer, Peter, et al Sommer Patentanwalt und European Patent and Trademark Attorney Viktoriastrasse 28 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Jeck Fleck Herrmann Patentanwälte Postfach 14 69 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/04] | Werffeli, Heinz R., Dipl.-Ing.ETH. Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 8125 Zollikerberg-Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99114124.3 | 19.07.1999 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070741 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070741 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/02, A61K9/20, A61K47/38, A61K47/32 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A61K47/38 (EP);
A61K47/32 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
C08L1/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L1/02, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Coprozessiertes Polysaccharidprodukt mit vernetztem Polyvinylpyrrolidon | [2001/04] | English: | Coprocessed polysaccharide product with crosslinked polyvinylpyrrolidone | [2001/04] | French: | Produit polysaccharidique co-travaillé avec du polyvinylpyrrolidone réticulé | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | LU | 19.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0123668 (SOPAR SA NV [BE]) [A] 1,14 * claim - *; | [A]EP0690302 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]WO9803064 (FMC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,11 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 17 - line 22 * * page 9, line 30 - line 32 * * examples 6-8; tables 6-8 *; | [X]US5840769 (KOLTER KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 28 - line 32 * * claim - * |