EP1070814 - Electrically unlockable lockmechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sesam Elektronische Sicherheitssysteme GmbH Oskar-v. Miller-Strasse 3 82291 Mammendorf / DE | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Otto Oskar-v. Miller-Strasse 3 82291 Mammendorf / DE | 02 /
Schönewolf, Holger An der Halde 11 86199 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Warsow, Thorsten Am Schloss 1 33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE | 04 /
Dellith, Bernhard Am Zollstock 37 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/04] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114506.1 | 23.07.1999 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070814 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/02 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
E05B47/0657 (EP);
E05B2047/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/41] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisch entriegelbarer Schliessmechanismus | [2001/04] | English: | Electrically unlockable lockmechanism | [2001/04] | French: | Méchanisme de serrure à déverrouillage électrique | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 28.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3208818 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST) [X] 1-13 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 20 * * page 9, line 31 - line 34 * * page 10, line 25 - line 34 * * page 12, line 19 - page 14, line 24; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 14,15; | [X]DE19721001 (REIN CLAUS DR) [X] 1-5,7,12-15 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 77; figures 4,5; claims 1,7,8 *; | [X]DE19724085 (KIEKERT AG) [X] 1-7,12 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO8102603 (SCOVILL SECURITY PROD ;CHEW I (GB); VERHAEG J (GB)) [X] 1,2,7-9,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 14,15; | [X]FR2728613 (CLAPIER BERNARD) [X] 1,2,7-9,11 * the whole document * |