EP0954057 - Connecting device for coaxial cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [2000/42] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Acke, Edgard Splethagestr. 41 8020 Oostkamp / BE | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114543.4 | 10.09.1996 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954057 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954057 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H01R9/053 (EP);
H01R9/0518 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/29] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anschlusseinrichtung für Koaxialkabel | [1999/44] | English: | Connecting device for coaxial cable | [1999/44] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement pour cable coaxial | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96938931.1 / EP0852079 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.11.2002 | SE | 27.02.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2003/19] | SE | 27.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2638574 (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0599882 (KINETIC LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0597579 (WHITAKER CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5021010 (WRIGHT JOHN O) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |