EP0988911 - Drill for percussion drilling machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallatz, Armin Horb Strasse 8 72186 Empfingen / DE | 02 /
Haug, Willi Merzenbergstrasse 37 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | 03 /
Saier, Walter Im Maiacker 32 72160 Horb-Grünmettstetten / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 99114563.2 | 24.07.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998141593 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841593 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0988911 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0988911 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02, B25D17/08 | [2000/13] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | Bohrer für Hammerbohrmaschinen | [2000/13] | English: | Drill for percussion drilling machines | [2000/13] | French: | Foret pour machine de forage à percusssion | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/22] | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1343206 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]US3792740 (COOLEY W) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 15 - line 20 * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0426632 (BEREMA AB [SE]) [X] 1-3 * figure . *; | [A]US5082067 (TORNQVIST PETER J T [SE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 4 * * figure 1 * |