EP0978718 - Method for detection of smoke by means of a LIDAR system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. 53175 Bonn / DE | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werner, Christian, Dr. Dachstrasse 36 81243 München / DE | 02 /
Streicher, Jürgen, Dr. Oberdorferstrasse 20 82278 Althegnenberg / DE | 03 /
Klier, Michael Kiefernstrasse 89 82178 Puchheim / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht Patentanwalt Postfach 1520 82102 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofplatz 2 82102 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114813.1 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | DE1998135797 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19835797 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978718 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978718 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/53, G01S17/95 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G08B17/10 (EP,US);
G01N21/538 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/95 (EP);
G01S7/497 (EP);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung von Rauch mittels eines Lidar-Systems | [2000/06] | English: | Method for detection of smoke by means of a LIDAR system | [2000/06] | French: | Procédé de détection de fumée au moyen d'un système à Lidar | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 08.12.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.01.2002 | GR | 02.01.2002 | IE | 02.01.2002 | NL | 02.01.2002 | DK | 02.04.2002 | PT | 02.04.2002 | SE | 02.04.2002 | LU | 29.07.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
LU | 29.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | NL | 02.01.2002 | |
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 02.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4397549 (MORGAN CLIFFORD E) [A] 1-8 * column 8 *; | [A]EP0635731 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* column 2 *; | [X] - COLLIS R T H ET AL, "Mie scattering techniques for air pollution measurement with lasers", OPTO-ELECTRONICS, MAY 1972, UK, vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0030-4077, pages 87 - 99, XP002123707 [X] 1-8 * page 97 - page 99 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01421174 | [X] - ROY G ET AL, "Lidar-inversion technique based on total integrated backscatter calibrated curves", APPLIED OPTICS, 20 NOV. 1993, USA, vol. 32, no. 33, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6754 - 6763, XP002123708 [X] 1-8 * page 6755 - page 6756 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.32.006754 | [A] - LOFSTROM P ET AL, "Concentration fluctuation model for decision-makers based on joint tracer and lidar measurements from a non-buoyant elevated plume", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AIR POLLUTION. PART 1 (OF 2);BARCELONA, SPAIN SEP 27-29 1994, Int Conf Air Pollut Proc;International Conference on Air Pollution - Proceedings 1994 Computational Mechanics Publ, Southampton, Engl, (1994), vol. 1, pages 571 - 579, XP002123709 [A] 1-8 * page 571 - page 579 * | [A] - DYBDAHL A W, "Use of LIDAR for Emissions Source Opacity Determinations", NATL. ENFORCEMENT INVESTIG. CENT., DENVER, CO, USA, (1981), XP002123710 [A] 1-8 * abstract * |