EP0978689 - Gas turbine combustor by-pass valve device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ojiro, Yasuhiro, c/o Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Akagi, Koichi, c/o Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Yoichi, c/o Takasago Machinery Works 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Kubota, Jun, c/o Takasago Research & Development 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Umemura, Sunao, c/o Takasago Research & Development 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114864.4 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19980218975 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: JP 21897598 | JP19980304037 | 26.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30403798 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978689 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978689 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978689 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/26, F01D17/10, F16K1/22 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
F01D17/10 (EP,US);
F01D17/105 (EP,US);
F01D17/148 (EP,US);
F23R3/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/06] | F23R3/26, F01D17/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/27] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umgehungsventil für eine Gasturbinenbrennkammer | [2000/06] | English: | Gas turbine combustor by-pass valve device | [2000/06] | French: | Clapet de détournement pour une chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121264.4 / EP1160511 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.12.2003 | FR | 03.12.2003 | IT | 03.12.2003 | LI | 03.12.2003 | GB | 29.07.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 03.12.2003 | |
FR | 03.12.2003 | ||
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
GB | 29.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CH | 03.12.2003 | |
LI | 03.12.2003 | ||
GB | 29.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | CH | 03.12.2003 | |
LI | 03.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH1026353 ; | [Y]GB2064730 (SCHLEICHER LEONHARD) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 69 - line 83 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0383185 (BACHMANN CORPORATE SERVICES [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 5 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4977791 (ERICHSEN VOLKER Y [DE]) [Y] 1,5 * column 2, line 19 - line 63 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4187878 (HUGHEY JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-5,9 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 5 * * figures 1,7 *; | [X]EP0751282 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 6-8 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 34 * * column 7, line 35 - line 48 * * figures 3A,5,7 *; | [X]US5351473 (SHUBA BRIAN H [US]) [X] 6 * column 3, line 19 - line 35 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE1815229 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 6-9 * page 3, line 10 - line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5375411 (ASCHENBRUCK EMIL [DE], et al) [A] 6-8 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2669090 (JACKSON ROBERT J) [A] 6-8 * column 3, line 19 - line 31 * * figures 1-3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10026353 A 19980127 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1,2,5 * abstract * * figure 7 * |