EP0981248 - Image information applying method and apparatus and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knowledge Modeling Institute Inc. 3-30-4, Honcho Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Knowledge Modeling Institute Inc. 3-30-4, Honcho Nakano-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuzuki, Tadao 302 Garden Heim Umeno, 5-12-14 Ogikubo Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115120.0 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | JP19980231513 | 18.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23151398 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981248 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0981248 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
H04N21/4438 (EP);
G11B7/00 (KR);
H04N21/234318 (EP);
H04N21/2543 (EP);
H04N21/4725 (EP);
H04N21/47815 (EP);
H04N21/858 (EP);
H04N7/17318 (EP);
H04N5/775 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildinformationanwendungsverfahren und Vorrichtung und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2000/08] | English: | Image information applying method and apparatus and recording medium | [2000/08] | French: | Méthode d'application d'information d'image et appareil et support d'enregistrement | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 29.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5451998 (HAMRICK DANIEL C [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 4 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 20 - column 4, line 28 * * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 56 *; | [A]US5454722 (HOLLAND SIMON [US], et al); | [A]US5541662 (ADAMS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5345549 (APPEL ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]WO9526536 (ROBERT WAXMAN INC [US]); | [A]WO9729458 (ACTV INC [US], et al) |