EP0981047 - Method and apparatus for ultrasonic inspection of steel pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2008/13] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | ||
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Tatsuya NKK Corp., Intel.Prop.Dept. 1-1,Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 02 /
Iizuka, Yukinori NKK Corp., Intel.Prop.Dept. 1-1,Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 03 /
Matsufuji, Yasuhiro NKK Corp., Intel.Prop.Dept. 1-1,Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Takeo NKK Corp., Intel.Prop.Dept. 1-1,Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115135.8 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | JP19980228015 | 12.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22801598 | JP19980271326 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27132698 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981047 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0981047 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981047 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/11, G01N29/22 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G01N29/225 (EP);
G01N29/043 (EP);
G01N29/07 (EP);
G01N29/2487 (EP);
G01N29/449 (EP);
G01N2291/0234 (EP);
G01N2291/0421 (EP);
G01N2291/0422 (EP);
G01N2291/056 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/08] | G01N29/18, G01N29/22 | Designated contracting states | DE [2003/15] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für die Ultraschallprüfung von Stahlröhren | [2000/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for ultrasonic inspection of steel pipes | [2000/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'inspection par ultrasons de tubes en acier | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07009949.4 / EP1818674 | EP07022499.3 / EP1882923 | EP08007243.2 / EP1950559 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62194454 ; | [AD]JPH08261992 ; | [A]JPS62192653 ; | [A]US4821575 (FUJIKAKE YOICHI ET AL) [A] 1,12,17,18 * abstract * * column 5, lines 38-68 *; | [A]US4406167 (MAEDA TARO) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 7-57 *; | [A]JPH07128305 ; | [A]US4627289 (FUKUDA SHINICHI ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880213), vol. 012, no. 048, Database accession no. (P - 666), & JP62194454 A 19870826 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08261992 A 19961011 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [AD] 5,6,12,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880212), vol. 012, no. 046, Database accession no. (P - 665), & JP62192653 A 19870824 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5,6,12,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07128305 A 19950519 (TOSHIBA ENG & CONSTR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |