EP0985597 - Motorcycle with a tiltable seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Karl Heinz Auenweg 21 86916 Kaufering / DE | 02 /
Krams, Peter Strada Rosero 53 10020 Pecetto To.Se-To / IT | 03 /
Sievers-Paulsen, Johann Sommerstrasse 2B 85354 Freising / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99115206.7 | 31.07.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998141749 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841749 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985597 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985597 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985597 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/10 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B62J1/10 (EP,US);
B62J1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/26] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Motorrad mit eienm schwenkbaren Sitz | [2000/11] | English: | Motorcycle with a tiltable seat | [2000/11] | French: | Motocyclette avec siège basculable | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4563038 (HIROSE MUTSUO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US4413700 (SHIRATSUCHI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5107949 (GOTOH TEISHIROH [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0751062 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3026789 |