EP0982296 - Perfuming and flavouring agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dragoco Gerberding & Co Aktiengesellschaft Dragocostrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2001/13] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Dragoco Gerberding & Co. GmbH Dragocostrasse 1 D-37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sabater-Lüntzel, Christopher, Dr. Am Stockfeld 11 37671 Höxter-Ottbergen / DE | 02 /
Widder, Sabine, Dr. Quittenweg 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | 03 /
Pickenhagen, Wilhelm, Dr. An der Kiliankirche 14 37671 Höxter / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Eikenberg & Stilkenböhmer Patentanwälte, Schackstrasse 1 30175 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Eikenberg, Kurt-Rudolf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwalt Schackstrasse 1 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115239.8 | 02.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998137702 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837702 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982296 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982296 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/22, C07C323/12, C07D317/20, C07D319/08, C07C319/04, A23L1/226, A61K7/46 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C11B9/0011 (EP,US);
A23L27/2022 (EP,US);
C07C323/22 (EP,US);
C07D317/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Duft- und Aromastoff | [2000/09] | English: | Perfuming and flavouring agents | [2000/09] | French: | Agents parfumants et aromatisants | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2003 | LU | 02.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | CY | 02.08.2003 | |
LU | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 02.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2338680 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [A] 1-5 * Seite 7, Zeile 24; Ansprüche *; | [A]US4496600 (PARLIMENT THOMAS H [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * Beispiel 3; Ansprüche 1, 4 *; | [PX]EP0924198 (DRAGOCO GERBERDING CO AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * Beispiel 3 *; | [A] - P. WERKHOFF ET AL, ADV. FOOD SCI., (1996), vol. 18, no. 1/2, pages 19 - 27, XP002125411 [A] 1,3-5 * Seite 23 * | [A] - H.W. SCHNABEL ET AL, JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1974), no. 3, pages 477 - 495, XP002125412 [A] 1 * Seite 479, Verbindungen 10a-c * |