EP0978571 - Process for the pulsed introduction of oxygen and/or oxygen-containing gas mixtures into a melt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Technische Gase GmbH Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strigl, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Zeitlerstrasse 1 80995 München / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/06] | Zahn, Christoph LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115254.7 | 02.08.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | DE19981035272 | 04.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19835272 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978571 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, C21C5/46, C21C5/30, F27D3/16 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C21C5/30 (EP);
C21C5/4606 (EP);
C21C5/5217 (EP);
C22B9/026 (EP);
F27D3/16 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum pulsartigen Eintragen von Sauerstoff und/oder eines sauerstoffhaltigen Gasgemisches in eine Schmelze | [2000/06] | English: | Process for the pulsed introduction of oxygen and/or oxygen-containing gas mixtures into a melt | [2000/06] | French: | Procédé pour introduire de l'oxygène et/ou d'un mélange gazeux à oxygène dans un bain en fusion d'une façon pulsatoire | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.09.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2709234 (SALZGITTER PEINE STAHLWERKE) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [X]DE4335643 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1-4 *; | [XY]EP0544044 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1 * claims 1,3,6 * [Y] 2; | [Y]SU384875 ; | [Y]SU245158 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 09, Database accession no. 1974-16909V, XP002119852 & SU384875 A 19730829 (BORSHCHEVSKII I K ET AL) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1973), vol. 73, no. 28, Database accession no. 1973-39113u, XP002119853 & SU245158 A 00000000 (KOSTOGRYZOV VS TARASENKO) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |