EP0982116 - Biaxially oriented PET foil for use as SMD foil condensers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH Kasteler Strasse 45 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2007/45] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kliesch, Holger Grosse Kirchenstrasse 1 55252 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Hilkert, Gottfried Schützenstrasse 12 55291 Saulheim / DE | 03 /
Kurz, Rainer Aarblick 51 65307 Hettenheim / DE | 04 /
Hora, Franz Königsberger Strasse 19-21 65830 Kriftel / DE | 05 /
Bursch, Annegrete Im Rechacker 16 65385 Rüdesheim / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/06] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115657.1 | 07.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998139007 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19839007 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982116 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982116 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/16, B29C55/12, // C08J5/18, B29D7/01, H01G4/18 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B29C55/14 (KR);
B29C55/12 (EP,US);
H01G4/18 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | B29C55/16, B29C55/12, // C08J5/18, B29D7/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, LU [2005/01] |
Former [2004/48] | DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL | ||
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von biaxial orientierten PET-Folien und Verwendung derselben für Folienkondensatoren in der SMD-Technik | [2000/09] | English: | Biaxially oriented PET foil for use as SMD foil condensers | [2000/09] | French: | Feuille de PET à orientation biaxiale à utiliser pour des condensateurs à feuille | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9813414 (HOECHST DIAFOIL GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-16 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 23; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0402861 (DIAFOIL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 49; example - *; | [A]US5474730 (GUST STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1,7,12,14,16 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 57; example - *; | [DA]US5545364 (SONG IL-CHEON [KR], et al) [DA] 1,7 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 27; example - * |