EP0985857 - Detent-receiving sleeve for a shift shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INA-Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1 - 3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2002/34] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states INA Wälzlager Schaeffler oHG 91072 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnapp, Peter Gaismannshofstrasse 48 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99115728.0 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998140680 | 07.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19840680 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985857 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985857 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985857 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/24 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B60K20/00 (KR);
F16H61/24 (EP);
F16H63/38 (EP);
F16H2061/185 (EP);
F16H2061/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/22] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rastierhülse für eine Schaltwelle | [2000/11] | English: | Detent-receiving sleeve for a shift shaft | [2000/11] | French: | Manchon d'immobilisation d'un arbre de commande | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9603684 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 13 * * page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 9 * * abstract *; | [E]EP0974777 (KOCHENDOERFER & KIEP METALLVER [DE]) [E] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 1, line 48 * * column 3, line 17 - column 3, line 20 *; | [A]DE4307596 (SCHWARZBICH JOERG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 16 - column 5, line 45 * * abstract * |