EP0982426 - Detergent dispenser for washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proppe, Wolfgang, Ing. An der Felgenlake 46 13589 Berlin / DE | [2000/09] | Application number, filing date | 99115776.9 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998137200 | 17.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837200 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982426 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982426 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
D06F39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/46] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 18.08.2000 | Title | German: | Waschmittel-Einspülvorrichtung für Waschmaschinen | [2000/09] | English: | Detergent dispenser for washing machine | [2000/09] | French: | Distributeur de détergent de lavage pour machine à laver | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2555772 (BAUKNECHT GMBH G) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2022622 (DOMAR SA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0094034 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3710833 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3803196 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2555772 | DE19524368 |