EP0982867 - Flush-mounting module with rotatable antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/09] | Module | ||
[2005/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/52] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleyer, Andreas Michaelstrasse 31 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Thuersam, Markus Am Lindenhof 18 71263 Weil Der Stadt / DE | [2000/09] | Application number, filing date | 99115813.0 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998138912 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838912 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982867 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982867 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982867 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/08, H01Q1/14, H01Q17/00, H02J13/00, H04B1/03, H04B1/38, E04F19/08 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H01Q1/22 (EP);
H01Q1/14 (EP);
H01Q1/36 (EP);
H01Q1/38 (EP);
H01Q17/00 (EP);
H02J13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Unterputzmontage Modul mit einer schwenkbaren Antenne | [2005/30] | English: | Flush-mounting module with rotatable antenna | [2005/30] | French: | Module encastrable avec une antenne pivotante | [2005/30] |
Former [2000/09] | Modul | ||
Former [2000/09] | Module | ||
Former [2000/09] | Module | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | FR | 28.12.2005 | GB | 28.12.2005 | IE | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | AT | 11.08.2006 | LU | 11.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
AT | 11.08.2006 | ||
LU | 11.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
AT | 11.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1079681 ; | [PA]JPH1131201 ; | [A]US4464792 (OWERKO JOHN R [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 25; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10079681 A 19980324 (JIMBO ELECTRIC CO LTD;USHITA TAKASHI) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11031201 A 19990202 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [PA] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE4411290 | DE4422281 |