EP1000815 - Restraint system for the operator of an industrial truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2000/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niebuhr, Michael Lohe 1 b 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115939.3 | 13.08.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998151447 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851447 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000815 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000815 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/02, B60K37/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B60R21/02 (EP);
B60R2021/0051 (EP);
B60R2021/0053 (EP);
B60R2021/0074 (EP);
B60R2021/0226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2003/44] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rückhaltesystem für den Bediener eines Flurförderzeugs | [2000/20] | English: | Restraint system for the operator of an industrial truck | [2000/20] | French: | Système de retenue pour le conducteur d'un chariot de manutention | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 13.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4355819 (FRISBEE CLAUDE M) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7,9; | [YA]US4366881 (FRISBEE CLAUDE M) [Y] 9 * column 3, lines 33-35 * * columns 1-2; figure 1 * [A] 1-8; | [Y]US3979139 (HOFFMANN GUNTER, et al) [Y] 3,7 * column 5, lines 31-36; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3431995 (KIERNAN HENRY E) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3405921 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * page 3 - page 7; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4201824 | DE3405921 |