EP0995926 - Silent damper with anti-rattle shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wach, Joe 34510 North Hickory Court Ingleside, Illinois 60041 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115946.8 | 13.08.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | US19980177029 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: US 177029 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995926 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0995926 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995926 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/36, F16F9/02 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
F16F9/368 (EP,US);
F16F9/0209 (EP,US);
F16F9/3207 (EP,US);
F16F9/54 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/17] | F16F9/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/03] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Geräuschloser Dämpfer mit Antiklapperwelle | [2000/17] | English: | Silent damper with anti-rattle shaft | [2000/17] | French: | Amortisseur silencieux avec arbre anti-cliquetis | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012844.9 / EP1450065 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.12.2005 | IT | 07.12.2005 | GB | 13.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | IT | 07.12.2005 | |
GB | 13.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02129424 ; | [A]US4629167 (KIMURA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 9 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 2; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US4948103 (BOWDEN PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 9* column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5165324 (MARUOKA HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 9 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5518223 (BIVENS STEVEN L [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 14; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5697477 (HIRAMOTO KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900807), vol. 014, no. 364, Database accession no. (M - 1007), & JP02129424 A 19900517 (NIFCO INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4630857 | US4669893 | US4786098 | US4877115 | US4989700 | US5655634 | US5697477 | US5730263 |