EP0980749 - Process for the manufacture of a vehicle tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sergel, Horst Fuchsrain 20a 30657 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Glinz, Michael Greifswalderweg 7 31535 Neustadt / DE | [2000/08] | Application number, filing date | 99115996.3 | 14.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | DE1998137817 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837817 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980749 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980749 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/06, B29D30/00, B29C59/14, // B29C35/08 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B29D30/0005 (EP);
B29D30/08 (KR);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C59/08 (EP);
B29C59/14 (EP);
B29D2030/0011 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/08] | B29D30/06, // B29C35/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Fahrzeugluftreifens | [2000/08] | English: | Process for the manufacture of a vehicle tyre | [2000/08] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un pneu pour véhicule | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 24.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0796719 ; | [YA]FR2192907 (NEAL DUWARD [US]) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 24 * * figure - *[A] 1; | [Y]DE3023838 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 2,4,6 * page 4 - page 5, line 14 *; | [YA]US4715577 (GREENWOOD ALAN [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 1; | [Y]DE19507486 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,11,12 * abstract * * figures 2-4 *; | [Y]EP0788870 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,8,9,11,12 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *; | [PX]EP0870595 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 23, Database accession no. 1995-175169, XP002146338 & JPH0796719 A 19950411 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |