EP0980831 - Method and apparatus for removing wrappings from articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINOMEC AG Isenrietstrasse 20 8617 Mönchaltorf / CH | [2003/22] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states SINOMEC AG Isenrietstrasse 20 CH-8617 Mönchaltorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosshard, Ernst Neuwiesenstrasse 37 8604 Volketswil / CH | 02 /
Ochsner, Erwin Spitalstrasse 8 8840 Einsiedeln / DE | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Ellenberger, Maurice Zellweger Luwa AG Wilstrasse 11 8610 Uster / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Ellenberger, Maurice Zellweger Luwa AG Wilstrasse 11 8610 Uster / CH | Application number, filing date | 99116018.5 | 14.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | CH19980001716 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: CH 171698 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980831 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980831 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B65B69/0033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Hüllen an Gegenständen | [2000/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing wrappings from articles | [2000/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour enlever les enveloppes d' articles | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.05.2003 | IE | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | AT | 14.08.2003 | CY | 14.08.2003 | LU | 14.08.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 14.08.2003 | ||
LU | 14.08.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 14.08.2003 | ||
LU | 14.08.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 14.08.2003 | ||
LU | 14.08.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 14.08.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3822837 (PAVEL WILFRIED MASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 50; figure - * [Y] 7; | [A]EP0411523 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3,7 * column 3, line 27 - line 48 ** column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 33; figures 3-8 *; | [XY]EP0706946 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 5; figure - * [Y] 7 | by applicant | US4050223 |