EP0980832 - Reversible labelling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinbeis PPL GmbH Rosenheimer Strasse 51 83098 Brannenburg / DE | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Wilhelm Holzhamer Bogen 33 83624 Otterfing / DE | 02 /
Klimke, Rene Schiessstattstrasse 3 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | 03 /
Indlekofer, Peter Rudolf-Hansenblas-Str.7a 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116427.8 | 20.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | DE1998137861 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837861 | DE1999120736 | 05.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920736 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980832 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18, B65C9/00 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B65C9/00 (EP);
B65C9/1865 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | Antriebsrichtungsumsteuerbares Etikettieraggregat | [2000/08] | English: | Reversible labelling device | [2000/08] | French: | Etiqueteuse réversible | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/51] | 25.05.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0506597 (POLLS ROSELLO JUAN [ES]) [X] 1-4,17 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 52; figure - *; | [A]DE8706722U (HERMANN); | [A]FR2535683 (IND TECH ETIQUETAGE [FR]) | by applicant | DE1586393 |