EP0982222 - Rotatable flexible strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Profile GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michael, Bethge Am Thörenkamp 12 30900 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
Martin, Anders Dr. Mittelstrasse 27 31174 Schellerten / DE | [2000/09] | Application number, filing date | 99116459.1 | 21.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998138190 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838190 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982222 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982222 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62D35/00, B60K11/08, B60J10/00, B60J1/20, B60H1/34 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B62D35/00 (EP);
B60K11/085 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | B62D35/00, B60K11/08, B60J10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/50] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schwenkbare flexible Profilleiste | [2000/09] | English: | Rotatable flexible strip | [2000/09] | French: | Profilé inclinable flexible | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 03.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4929013 (EKE ALAN B [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 10; figure - *; | [A]DE2444116 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR1338277 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * page 3, column L, line 28 - line 43; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5273177 (CAMPBELL PHILLIP J [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 22; figures 11,12 *; | [A]GB2044686 (TRIPLEX SAFETY GLASS CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 96 - line 110; figure - *; | [A]US4585262 (PARKS ROBERT R [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 24; figure - * | by applicant | DE8806085U |