EP0984050 - Adhesive foil and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Dieter Drosselstieg 8 21635 Jork / DE | 02 /
Kehler, Harald Dr. Kirchdorfer Strasse 188 21109 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Schulze, Walter Elmshornerstrasse 34 25421 Pinneberg / DE | [2000/10] | Application number, filing date | 99116460.9 | 21.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | DE19981040361 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19840361 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984050 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984050 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/906 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/03] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klebfolie und ihre Verwendung | [2000/10] | English: | Adhesive foil and its use | [2000/10] | French: | Feuille adhésive et son utilisation | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02206671 ; | [A]DE2152871 (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG) [A] 1-5,8,12* claim 1 *; | [DA]DE3331016 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0974631 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 39, Database accession no. 1990-294103, XP002132808 & JPH02206671 A 19900816 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-4,7 * abstract * |