EP0989042 - Distribution or transport trolley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPRESSO DEUTSCHLAND TRANSPORTGERÄTE GmbH Antonius-Raab-Strasse 19 D-34123 Kassel / DE | [2000/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kratzenberg, Wolfgang Südstr. 16 34270 Schauenburg / DE | 02 /
Stein, Siegfried Scheideweg 3 34246 Vellmar / DE | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Patentanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116536.6 | 24.08.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998143486 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19843486 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0989042 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989042 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/00, B60L15/20, B62B5/06 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B60L15/2009 (EP);
B62B5/0026 (EP);
B62B5/06 (EP);
B62B5/0073 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | Verteiler-bzw. Zustellerwagen | [2000/13] | English: | Distribution or transport trolley | [2000/13] | French: | Véhicule de distribution ou de transport | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 25.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.02.2007 | FI | 07.02.2007 | FR | 07.02.2007 | IE | 07.02.2007 | IT | 07.02.2007 | NL | 07.02.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | ES | 18.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | AT | 24.08.2007 | LU | 24.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
FR | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
AT | 24.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
AT | 24.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 28.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 28.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 28.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4109186 (FARQUE ANTHONY) [Y] 1 * column 14, line 65 - column 15, line 1 *; | [A]FR2679669 (OURY PASCAL [FR], et al); | [A]EP0694432 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [YA]DE19723973 (EXPRESSO DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-10 |