EP0982926 - Method for recording still pictures on disk and apparatus for recording and reproducing still pictures on and from disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terauchi, Ikuo, Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116682.8 | 26.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | JP19980239324 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23932498 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982926 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982926 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982926 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N1/2166 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2001/51] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Speicherung von Standbildern auf einem Disk und Vorrichtung zur Speicherung und Wiedergabe von Standbildern auf und aus einem Disk | [2006/07] | English: | Method for recording still pictures on disk and apparatus for recording and reproducing still pictures on and from disk | [2000/09] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement d'images fixes sur un disque et appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'images fixes sur et à partir d'un disque | [2000/09] |
Former [2000/09] | Verfahren zur Speicherung von Standbildern auf einem Disk und Vorrichtung zur Speicherung und Wiedergabe von Standbilderna auf und aus einem Disk | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 02.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.07.2006 | LI | 05.07.2006 | [2007/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1075340 ; | [A]EP0336317 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5619571 (SANDSTROM BRENT B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 45 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 45 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10075340 A 19980317 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |