EP0990915 - Testing appliance for a connector with cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSK Prüfsysteme GmbH Strengelrott 4 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | [2000/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohme, Heinrich Höferweg 1 32602 Vlotho / DE | 02 /
Kopietz, Björn Jordanstrasse 1 30173 Hannover / DE | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116959.0 | 27.08.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | DE1998217517U | 01.10.1998 Original published format: DE 29817517 U | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0990915 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0990915 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/04 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G01R31/69 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Prüfen eines mit Kabeln versehenen Steckers | [2000/14] | English: | Testing appliance for a connector with cable | [2000/14] | French: | Appareil pour tester un connecteur avec cable | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5744966 (SATO TAKAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 62 - line 67; figures 1,5 * |