EP0986011 - Active properties for dynamic system configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation 800 Long Ridge Rd., P.O. Box 1600 Stamford, CT 06904-1600 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION 800 Long Ridge Rd., P.O. Box 1600 Stamford, CT 06904-1600 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Karin 1335 Alma Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Dourish, James P. 1040 Dolores Street 105 San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 03 /
Edwards, Warren K. 1527 Guerrero Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 04 /
Lamarca, Anthony G. 1727 Connecticut Dr. Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 05 /
Lamping, John O. 1299 Eva Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 06 /
Salisbury, Michael P. 49 Showers Drive, E254 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 07 /
Terry, Douglas B. 23 Tasker Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 08 /
Thornton, James D. 3312 Bay Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117041.6 | 30.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | US19980144231 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: US 144231 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986011 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0986011 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/93 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/40] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aktive Eigenschaften für dynamische Systemkonfiguration | [2000/11] | English: | Active properties for dynamic system configuration | [2000/11] | French: | Propriétés actives pour configuration dynamique d'un système | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9114222 (INTERLEAF INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 11 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 28 * * page 13, line 1 - page 19, line 22 *; | [X] - M. FREDRIKSSON, "Active Documents", SECOND HK/R STUDENT CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED OBJECT-ORIENTED CONCEPTS, Ronneby, SE, (19970117), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.ide.hk-r.se/~bosch/AOOC-papers.html, (20001020), XP002151012 [X] 1-6 * 2. Problem Description, p.1-3 * * 5. The Active Document Model, p.6-9 * * 6. The Active Document Environment, p.10 * | [X] - M. FREDRIKSSON & M. SVAHNBERG, Fargo: Technical Description, RONNEBY, SE, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF KARLSKRONA/RONNEBY, (1997), XP002151013 [X] 1-6 * 1. Introduction p.1 * * 3. Active Documents, p.3-4 * | [A] - G. STAROVIC, V. CAHILL & B. TANGNEY, An Event-Based Object Model for DIstributed Programming, DUBLIN, IE, TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN, TCD-CS-95-28, (199512), XP002151014 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * 2. Objects, events and constraints, p.2-6 * |