EP1008708 - A device for controlling the movement of handles for door and window frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUTEC S.r.l. Via Travnik 16 34147 S.Dorligo della Valle (TS) / IT | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balbo Di Vinadio, Aimone Via Canova, 1 20100 Milano / IT | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet 9 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 99117076.2 | 31.08.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | IT1998PD00288 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: IT PD980288 | [2000/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008708 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/06 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
E05B3/065 (EP);
E05B15/0013 (EP);
E05B15/0053 (EP);
E05B63/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | SI | 11.12.2000 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Bewegung eines Griffes für Tür- oder Fensterrahmen | [2000/24] | English: | A device for controlling the movement of handles for door and window frames | [2000/24] | French: | Dispositif de commande de mouvement d'une poignée pour châssis de porte ou de fenêtre | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE8702724U (HOPPE GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3,6,7; | [YA]BE1008973 (VAN PARYS REMI EMIEL) [Y] 3 * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,2,4; | [Y]DE9016080U (SCHÜRING GMBH & CO FENSTERTECHNOLOGIE KG) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, line 28 - line 32 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 10; figures 1,6-8 *; | [X]DE19614666 (VBL GMBH BAUBESCHLÄGE) [X] 1,2,4,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3402089 (GEBRÜDER GOLDSCHMIDT BAUBESCHLÄGE GMBH) [A] 1-3,8 * figures 1-6 * |