EP0984116 - Handrail system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWI Heinrich Wilke GmbH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states HEWI HEINRICH WILKE GMBH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnatz, Eckhard Am Kampfacker 6 A 35104 Lichtenfels / DE | 02 /
Rentel, Ewald Weserstrasse 9 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/10] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117131.5 | 31.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | DE19981040225 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19840225 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984116 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18, F16B7/04 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
F16B7/0413 (EP);
E04F11/1804 (EP);
E04F11/1808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | Handlaufsystem | [2000/10] | English: | Handrail system | [2000/10] | French: | Système de main courante | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2185798 (UMBERTO CONFALANIERI & C S R L) [X] 1-6,8,9,12,13 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE8634895U (PAN BAUSYSTEME GMBH) [X] 1-8 * page 9, line 16 - line 22 * * page 10, line 15 - page 13, line 26; figures 1-2B *; | [XA]DE3140556 (BARSELAK PETER;WIED PETER) [X] 1-6,8 * page 13, line 27 - page 19, line 4; figures 1-12 * [A] 9,12,13; | [XY]US4895332 (KRAHN GILBERT H ET AL) [X] 1-6,12,13 * column 2, line 25 - column 8, line 28; figures 1-10 * [Y] 8; | [X]US5396740 (BOCCHI GIUSEPPE) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column W *; | [YA]US4293122 (COLEMAN WILLIAM J ET AL) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 27 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,10,11 |