EP0983940 - Device for packaging objects or stacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winkler + Dünnebier Aktiengesellschaft Sohler Weg 65 56562 Neuwied / DE | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salm, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. Steppenbergallee 135 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Bernfried, Kutsch, Dr.-Ing. Leuwstrasse 36 52224 Stolberg / DE | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Schieferdecker, Lutz Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37 63065 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Schieferdecker, Lutz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37 63065 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117161.2 | 01.09.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | DE1998140077 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19840077 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983940 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983940 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/14, B65B59/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
B65B11/004 (EP);
B65B25/141 (EP,US);
B65B51/023 (EP);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US);
B65B7/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen oder von Stapeln | [2000/10] | English: | Device for packaging objects or stacks | [2000/10] | French: | Dispositif pour emballer des objets ou des piles | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 25.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.03.2004 | IT | 17.03.2004 | ES | 28.06.2004 | GB | 01.09.2004 | FR | 30.09.2004 | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/17] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
IT | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
GB | 01.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
GB | 01.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3908184 (OSTMA) [A] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE9208784U | DE19636262 |