EP0984546 - Running-in procedure for carbon brushes in permanent magnet motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berghänel Elektrotechnik Lützowstrasse 29 09119 Chemnitz / DE | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berghänel, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Lützowstrasse 29 09119 Chemnitz / DE | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte Am Alten Bad 6 09111 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte Am Alten Bad 6 09111 Chemnitz / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte, Postfach 213 09026 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117192.7 | 01.09.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | DE1998140053 | 02.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19840053 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984546 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984546 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984546 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K13/10, H01R39/18 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H02K13/10 (EP);
H01R39/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Extension states | SI | 20.09.1999 | Title | German: | Einlaufverfahren für Kohlebürsten in Permanentmagnetmotoren | [2000/10] | English: | Running-in procedure for carbon brushes in permanent magnet motors | [2000/10] | French: | Procédé de rodage pour des balais de moteurs à aimants permanents | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.04.2003 | GB | 16.04.2003 | IE | 16.04.2003 | DK | 16.07.2003 | GR | 16.07.2003 | PT | 16.07.2003 | AT | 01.09.2003 | CY | 01.09.2003 | BE | 30.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
DK | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
AT | 01.09.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
DK | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
DK | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
DK | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
DK | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GB | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 16.07.2003 | |
PT | 16.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1638270 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 5 * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 3 *; | [A]EP0647012 (BERGHAENEL ELEKTROTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 51 *; | [A]US5723932 (ITO MOTOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 44 *; | [A] - SHIMODA N ET AL, "A STUDY ON COMMUTATION ARC AND WEAR OF BRUSH IN GASOLINE OF D.C. MOTOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE HOLM CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL CONTACTS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930927), vol. CONF. 39, pages 151 - 156, XP000419866 [A] 1 * page 151 - page 154 * | [A] - YAMAMOTO T ET AL, "A STUDY ON BRUSH WEAR UNDER COMMUTATION ARCS IN GASOLINE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY: PART A,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (19960901), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1070-9886, pages 376 - 383, XP000624143 [A] 1 * page 379 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/95.536839 |